Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Boyvin de Péricard

Deceased

Bishop of Evreux


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1583Born
12 Dec 161128.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Evreux, France
12 Dec 161128.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tarsus
16 Dec 161229.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tarsus
26 Nov 161330.9SucceededBishop of Evreux, France
26 Jan 161431.0InstalledBishop of Evreux, France
21 Aug 164663.6DiedBishop of Evreux, France

MicroData Summary for François Boyvin de Péricard:
Bishop François Boyvin de Péricard (died ) Bishop of Evreux

  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 179, and Page 328
  • b: La France Pontificale, Volume 14, Page 64
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1612, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015