Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Bertaut

Deceased

Bishop of Sées {Séez}, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1555²Born
5 Mar 160752.1AppointedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
11 Nov 160752.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sées {Séez}, France
8 Jun 161156.4DiedBishop of Sées {Séez}, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean Bertaut
Bishop Jean Bertaut (born 1555, died ) Bishop of Sées {Séez}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonnay

  • a bishop for 3.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 299
  • b: La France Pontificale, Volume 14
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1607, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast