Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vicente Bernikon

Deceased

Bishop of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1907Born
7 Jul 194032.5Ordained PriestPriest of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea
9 May 197466.4AppointedBishop of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea
25 Aug 197466.7Ordained BishopBishop of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea
14 Sep 197668.7DiedBishop of Malabo, Equatorial Guinea

MicroData Summary for Vicente Bernikon
Bishop Vicente Bernikon (born , died ) Bishop of Malabo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBasakato del Oeste
Ordained BishopMalabo, Diocese of Malabo

  • a priest for 36.1 years
  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 35, Number 2,118

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast