Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Malabo

Archidioecesis Malaboensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ildefonso Obama Obono, Archbishop

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 15 October 1982
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Equatorial Guinea
  • Square Kilometers: 2,034 (785 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Apartado 106, Malabo, Bioko Norte, Guinea Ecuatorial
  • Telephone: (09)2909
  • Fax: 21.76

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Annobon, Corisco and Fernando Poo Islands
10 October 1855ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Two Guineas and Senegambia {Guinea Superiore e Inferiore e di Sierra Leone} Vicariate Apostolic of Annobon, Corisco and Fernando Poo Islands (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Fernando Poo
12 May 1904SplitVicariate Apostolic of Annobon, Corisco and Fernando Poo Islands Vicariate Apostolic of Fernando Poo
9 August 1965Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Fernando Poo Vicariate Apostolic of Río Muni (erected)
Diocese of Santa Isabel
3 May 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Fernando Poo Diocese of Santa Isabel
Diocese of Malabo
14 April 1974Name ChangedDiocese of Santa Isabel Diocese of Malabo
Archdiocese of Malabo
15 October 1982ElevatedDiocese of Malabo Archdiocese of Malabo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Santa Isabel
197058,51270,50083.0%23232,544313471ap1971
Diocese of Malabo
198068,00072,00094.4%42611,33322021ap1981
Archdiocese of Malabo
199077,80089,00087.4%717243,241317526ap1991
199977,85290,52686.0%516213,707205830ap2000
200077,85290,00086.5%616223,538275830ap2001
200177,85290,00086.5%811194,097205830ap2002
200277,85290,00086.5%1011213,707205830ap2003
2003238,923265,47090.0%11122310,387215831ap2004
2004238,923265,47090.0%10122210,860145832ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 29 May 2013