Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Berard Toshio Oshikawa, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop Emeritus of Naha, Japan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1941 Born
15 Aug 196423.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
21 Dec 196726.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
24 Jan 199755.8AppointedBishop of Naha, Japan
25 May 199756.1Ordained BishopBishop of Naha, Japan
9 Dec 201776.7RetiredBishop of Naha, Japan

MicroData Summary for Berard Toshio Oshikawa
Bishop Berard Toshio Oshikawa O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Naha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaikuma
Ordained BishopAuditorium, Laguna Garden Hotel, Ginowan City

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Naha.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,007
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2011, Page 492
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2017
  • sole: CB, 9 Dec 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast