Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Percival Caza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1896Born
29 Jun 192225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
7 Aug 194851.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
7 Aug 194851.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Albulae
19 Oct 194852.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Albulae
24 Jul 195558.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
22 Sep 196670.1SucceededBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
18 Mar 196972.5RetiredBishop of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada
18 Mar 196972.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotaria
26 Nov 197074.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Rotaria
12 Feb 197679.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Valleyfield, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Percival Caza
Bishop Percival Caza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valleyfield

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Anicet

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast