Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giacomo Giuseppe Beltritti

Deceased

Patriarch Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1910Born
15 Apr 193322.3Ordained PriestPriest of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
21 Sep 196554.7AppointedCoadjutor Patriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
21 Sep 196554.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Cana
10 Oct 196554.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cana
25 Nov 197059.9SucceededPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
11 Dec 198776.9RetiredPatriarch of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
1 Nov 199281.8DiedPatriarch Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Giuseppe Beltritti
Patriarch Giacomo Giuseppe Beltritti (born , died ) Patriarch Emeritus of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeveragno

  • a priest for 59.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast