Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emmanuel-François de Bausset-Roquefort

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1731Born
6 Jul 176634.5SelectedBishop of Fréjus, France
6 Aug 176634.6ConfirmedBishop of Fréjus, France
31 Aug 176634.6Ordained BishopBishop of Fréjus, France
1801¹69.0ResignedBishop of Fréjus, France
10 Feb 180270.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Fréjus, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emmanuel-François de Bausset-Roquefort
Bishop Emmanuel-François de Bausset-Roquefort (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fréjus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille

  • a bishop for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 218
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1766, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast