Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Loría Garita

Bishop Emeritus of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1937 Born
21 Dec 196326.0Ordained PriestPriest of San José de Costa Rica
31 Jul 200365.6AppointedBishop of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica
1 Oct 200365.8Ordained BishopBishop of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica
24 Dec 201376.0RetiredBishop of San Isidro de El General, Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Loría Garita
Bishop Guillermo Loría Garita (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Isidro de El General

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTierra Blanca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Isidro de El General.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Number 14,470
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast