Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Edward Mulvee

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Providence, Rhode Island, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1930Born
30 Jun 195727.3Ordained PriestPriest of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
15 Feb 197747.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
15 Feb 197747.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Summa
14 Apr 197747.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Summa
19 Feb 198555.0AppointedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
9 Feb 199564.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
27 Mar 199565.1InstalledCoadjutor Bishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
11 Jun 199767.3SucceededBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
31 Mar 200575.1RetiredBishop of Providence, Rhode Island, USA
28 Dec 201888.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Providence, Rhode Island, USA

MicroData Summary for Robert Edward Mulvee
Bishop Robert Edward Mulvee (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Providence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston, MA, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Death PlaceNorth Smithfield, RI, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island
Buried Place (Original)St. Ann, Cemetery, Cranston, RI, Diocese of Providence, Rhode Island

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 28 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Jan 2019

Quantcast