Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Cerasi

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1643Born
5 Feb 168541.3AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
11 Feb 168541.3Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
11 Dec 172885.1DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Cerasi
Bishop Angelo Cerasi (born , died ) Bishop of Bovino

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuonabitacolo

  • a bishop for 43.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1726
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 125
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1685, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast