Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Casati

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Trapezus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1620¹Born
2 Jun 167050.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
15 Jun 167050.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Trapezus
16 Oct 170282.7DiedTitular Archbishop of Trapezus

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Casati
Archbishop Francesco Casati (born 1620, died ) Titular Archbishop of Trapezus

EventPlace
Birth PlacePlaisance
Ordained BishopStigmates de S. Francois, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 386
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 7
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 72, Number 5,711

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast