Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François d’Etienne de Prunières de Saint-Jean

Deceased

Bishop of Grasse, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Apr 1718Born
12 Mar 175334.9AppointedBishop of Grasse, France
20 May 175335.0Ordained BishopBishop of Grasse, France
12 Mar 179980.9DiedBishop of Grasse, France

MicroData Summary for François d’Etienne de Prunières de Saint-Jean
Bishop François d’Etienne de Prunières de Saint-Jean (born , died ) Bishop of Grasse

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGap

  • a bishop for 45.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1753, Number 8
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 228

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast