Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Pallu, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

Titular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1626BornTours, France
29 Jul 165831.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tonking, Viet Nam
29 Jul 165831.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
17 Nov 165832.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Heliopolis in Augustamnica
15 Apr 168053.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China
29 Oct 168458.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien, China

MicroData Summary for François Pallu:
Bishop François Pallu M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Fo-Kien

  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 120, Number 735
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 201

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013