Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Placide-Louis du Chemin, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Baghdad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1607¹BornRouen
30 May 166154.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Baghdad, Iraq
30 May 166154.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Bithynia
5 Jun 166154.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Neocaesarea in Bithynia
10 Apr 166962.2SucceededBishop of Baghdad, Iraq
7 Nov 168275.8DiedBishop of Baghdad, Iraq

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Placide-Louis du Chemin:
Bishop Placide-Louis du Chemin O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Baghdad

  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 107
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015