Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Piazza

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1612¹Born
10 Nov 165947.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
16 Nov 165947.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)
11 Oct 169078.7DiedTitular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Camillo Piazza (VIAF: 89361710)
Bishop Camillo Piazza (born 1612, died ) Titular Bishop of Dragobitia (Drago)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForli, Diocese of Forli, Italy, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Lorenzo in Damaso, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 177
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 33
  • obp: AT, 4 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jan 2017