Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Augustine John Ryan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Munatiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Aug 1923Born
3 Jun 195026.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
6 Apr 195733.6IncardinatedPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
28 Feb 197753.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
28 Feb 197753.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Munatiana
9 May 197753.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Munatiana
4 Jun 198561.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Augustine John Ryan
Bishop Gerald Augustine John Ryan (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained BishopSt. Agnes, Cathedral, Rockville Centre, Diocese of Rockville Centre, New York

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for 8.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 41, Number 2,671

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast