Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Joseph Daly

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Castra Nova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1921Born
22 May 194826.7Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
6 Apr 195735.6IncardinatedPriest of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
28 Feb 197755.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
28 Feb 197755.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Nova
9 May 197755.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Nova
1 Jul 199674.8RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Rockville Centre, New York, USA
14 Oct 201392.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for James Joseph Daly
Bishop James Joseph Daly (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Rockville Centre

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York

  • a priest for 65.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast