Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Carlos Alfonso Azpiroz Costa, O.P.

Archbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1956 Born
28 Feb 198124.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Mar 198427.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Aug 198629.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Aug 198730.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
14 Jul 200144.7AppointedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
5 Sep 201053.8ResignedMaster General of Order of Friars Preachers
3 Nov 201559.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
22 Dec 201559.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
12 Jul 201760.7SucceededArchbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos Alfonso Azpiroz Costa (VIAF: 101099778)
Archbishop Carlos Alfonso Azpiroz Costa O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Bahía Blanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bahía Blanca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2015
  • ob: CB, 3 Nov 2015
  • c2+: CB, 23 Nov 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,694
  • s: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jul 2017