Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop 聲gel Antonio Recinos Lemus

Bishop of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1963 BornAzulco
3 Dec 199431.3Ordained PriestPriest of Jalapa, Guatemala
22 Feb 201652.5AppointedBishop of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas, Guatemala
21 May 201652.8Ordained BishopBishop of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas, Guatemala

MicroData Summary for 聲gel Antonio Recinos Lemus
Bishop 聲gel Antonio Recinos Lemus (born ) Bishop of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zacapa y Santo Cristo de Esquipulas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2016
  • ob: CB, 3 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016