Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Arturo Celestino Álvarez

Deceased

Bishop of Calabozo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1870BornClarines
26 Nov 189323.6Ordained PriestPriest of Calabozo, Venezuela
16 Aug 191040.4AppointedBishop of Zulia, Venezuela
6 Nov 191040.6Ordained BishopBishop of Zulia, Venezuela
18 Dec 191949.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
18 Dec 191949.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thapsus
9 May 192151.1SucceededBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela
8 Jan 195281.8DiedBishop of Calabozo, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Arturo Celestino Álvarez:
Bishop Arturo Celestino Álvarez (born , died ) Bishop of Calabozo

  • a priest for 58.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 72
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 102

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013