Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manoel Antônio de Paiva (Payva)

Deceased

Bishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1873BornGurinhem
15 Nov 189623.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 191541.9AppointedBishop of Ilhéus, Baia, Brazil
18 Jul 191542.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ilhéus, Baia, Brazil
8 Aug 191542.3InstalledBishop of Ilhéus, Baia, Brazil
2 Apr 192955.9AppointedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
19 May 193764.1DiedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manoel Antônio de Paiva (Payva):
Bishop Manoel Antônio de Paiva (Payva) (born , died ) Bishop of Garanhuns

  • a priest for 40.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013