Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilfred Chikpa Anagbe, C.M.F.

Bishop of Makurdi, Nigeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1965 Born
8 Sep 198722.4ProfessedMember of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
6 Aug 199429.3Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
8 Jul 201449.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Makurdi, Nigeria
4 Oct 201449.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Makurdi, Nigeria
28 Mar 201549.9SucceededBishop of Makurdi, Nigeria

MicroData Summary for Wilfred Chikpa Anagbe
Bishop Wilfred Chikpa Anagbe C.M.F. (born ) Bishop of Makurdi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAondona

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Makurdi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2014
  • ob: CB, 28 Jul 2014
  • c2: CB, 4 Oct 2014
  • c34: CB, 9 Oct 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Number 18,303
  • s: Bollettino, 28 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast