Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-Joseph-Marie Auneau, S.M.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Shiré

Titular Bishop of Cerasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1876BornMésanger, France
15 Jul 190024.4Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Company of Mary
9 May 191034.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Shiré, Malawi
9 May 191034.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cerasus
1 Nov 191034.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cerasus
25 Dec 194973.9RetiredVicar Apostolic of Shiré, Malawi
5 Nov 195983.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Shiré, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Louis-Joseph-Marie Auneau:
Bishop Louis-Joseph-Marie Auneau S.M.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Shiré

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 49.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1910, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013