Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adam Ernst Joseph Bernclau von Schönreith

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Oct 1712BornSchönreith
18 Dec 173422.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Regensburg, Germany
1 May 173522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Regensburg, Germany
22 Dec 176654.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
22 Dec 176654.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
22 Feb 176754.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila in Palaestina
24 Jul 177966.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Adam Ernst Joseph Bernclau von Schönreith:
Bishop Adam Ernst Joseph Bernclau von Schönreith (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,651
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 61, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 15 Sep 2013