Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Font y Farrés, C.M.F. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tarija, Bolivia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1874Born
21 Sep 190127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionary Sons of the Immaculate Heart of Mary
17 Nov 192450.7AppointedBishop of Tarija, Bolivia
15 Mar 192551.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tarija, Bolivia
16 Aug 194773.4DiedBishop of Tarija, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Ramón Font y Farrés
Bishop Ramón Font y Farrés C.M.F. (born , died ) Bishop of Tarija

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRupit, Spain

  • a priest for 45.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c23: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,925, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast