Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nemesio Rivera Meza

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cajamarca

Titular Bishop of Diospolis Superior


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1918BornSan Jerónimo de Tunán
21 Sep 194628.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 May 195839.8AppointedBishop of Huacho, Peru
20 Jul 195839.9Ordained BishopBishop of Huacho, Peru
28 Jan 196041.5AppointedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
8 Jul 196142.9ResignedBishop of Cajamarca, Peru
8 Jul 196142.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Diospolis Superior
9 Jan 200788.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Cajamarca, Peru

MicroData Summary for Nemesio Rivera Meza:
Bishop Nemesio Rivera Meza (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cajamarca

  • a priest for 60.3 years
  • a bishop for 48.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013