Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Joaquín Manuel Eloy Arróspide y Echeverría

Deceased

Bishop of Melo, Uruguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jun 1862Born
20 Dec 189028.4Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 192260.0AppointedBishop of Melo, Uruguay
25 Feb 192360.6Ordained BishopBishop of Melo, Uruguay
18 Apr 192865.8DiedBishop of Melo, Uruguay

MicroData Summary for José Joaquín Manuel Eloy Arróspide y Echeverría
Bishop José Joaquín Manuel Eloy Arróspide y Echeverría (born , died ) Bishop of Melo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTolosa, Spain

  • a priest for 37.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 10
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1868, Page 148, Number 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast