Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Vassallo di Torregrossa

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Germany

Titular Archbishop of Hemesa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Dec 1865BornSan Cataldo
22 Sep 188822.7Ordained PriestPriest of Caltanissetta, Italy
25 Nov 191347.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
3 Dec 191347.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
18 Jan 191448.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Hemesa
29 Aug 191549.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
2 May 191650.3AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Argentina
5 Jul 191650.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
5 Jan 192054.0AppointedApostolic Internuncio to Paraguay
6 Aug 192054.6AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Paraguay
14 Jul 192256.5ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Argentina
8 Jun 192559.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Germany
31 May 193468.4RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Germany
7 Sep 195993.7DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Germany

MicroData Summary for Alberto Vassallo di Torregrossa:
Archbishop Alberto Vassallo di Torregrossa (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Germany

  • a priest for 71.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013