Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jonas de Araújo Batinga

Deceased

Bishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1865Born
30 Nov 188823.6Ordained PriestPriest of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil
28 Jan 191852.8AppointedBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil
14 Jul 191853.3Ordained BishopBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil
30 Jul 194075.3DiedBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jonas de Araújo Batinga
Bishop Jonas de Araújo Batinga (born , died ) Bishop of Penedo

EventPlace
Birth PlacePenedo

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,918, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast