Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adalberto Accioli Sobral

Deceased

Archbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1887BornJaparatuba
12 Nov 191124.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 192739.7AppointedBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Baia, Brazil
4 Sep 192740.1Ordained BishopBishop of Barra (do Rio Grande), Baia, Brazil
13 Jan 193446.4AppointedBishop of Pesqueira, Pernambuco, Brazil
18 Jan 194759.5AppointedArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
24 May 1951³63.8DiedArchbishop of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Adalberto Accioli Sobral:
Archbishop Adalberto Accioli Sobral (born , died ) Archbishop of São Luís do Maranhão

  • a priest for 39.5 years
  • a bishop for 23.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1927, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013