Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Santiago Agrelo Martínez, O.F.M.

Archbishop Emeritus of Tanger, Morocco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1942 Born
23 Dec 196321.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
13 Aug 196624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
11 Apr 200764.8AppointedArchbishop of Tanger, Morocco
17 Jun 200764.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tanger, Morocco
24 May 201976.9RetiredArchbishop of Tanger, Morocco

MicroData Summary for Santiago Agrelo Martínez (VIAF: 307316926)
Archbishop Santiago Agrelo Martínez O.F.M. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Tanger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAsados, Spain
Ordained BishopCathedral, Tanger, Archdiocese of Tanger

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tanger.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,436
  • r: Bollettino, 24 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast