Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sébastien-Michel Amelot

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vannes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1741Born
10 Nov 177433.1SelectedBishop of Vannes, France
3 Apr 177533.5ConfirmedBishop of Vannes, France
23 Apr 177533.6Ordained BishopBishop of Vannes, France
2 Apr 182987.5DiedBishop of Vannes, France

MicroData Summary for Sébastien-Michel Amelot
Bishop Sébastien-Michel Amelot (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vannes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAngers

  • a bishop for 53.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 9
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 436

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast