Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Lisboa de Oliveira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Feb 1916Born
27 Jun 194832.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 Feb 196347.0AppointedBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
26 May 196347.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
7 Nov 198670.7ResignedBishop of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil
24 Jan 200285.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Nazaré, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Lisboa de Oliveira
Bishop Manuel Lisboa de Oliveira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nazaré

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonte Alegre da Bahía

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast