Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Petronio Veroni, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Boiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1600BornBologna
8 Jan 165251.3AppointedBishop of Boiano, Italy
21 Jan 165251.3Ordained BishopBishop of Boiano, Italy
11 May 165352.6DiedBishop of Boiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Petronio Veroni:
Bishop Petronio Veroni O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Boiano

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 114, Number 695
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 23 Dec 2013