Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Boncompagni

Deceased

Archbishop of Bologna

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1622BornIsola
11 Dec 165129.7AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
4 Feb 165229.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
14 Jan 166441.8Elevated to Cardinal
11 Feb 166441.8InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
24 Jan 168461.8DiedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Boncompagni:
Girolamo Cardinal Boncompagni (born , died ) Archbishop of Bologna

  • a bishop for 31.9 years
  • a cardinal for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Jan 1664
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 114, Number 696
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1652, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 25 May 2015