Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Giordano, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Lacedonia


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Oct 1651AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
29 Oct 1651Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
9 Nov 1661DiedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Giordano:
Bishop Giacomo Giordano O.S.B. (died ) Bishop of Lacedonia

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 215
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1651, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 27 Mar 2015