Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Cardinal Bichi

Deceased

Bishop of Osimo

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1614BornSiena
8 Dec 165238.6Ordained BishopBishop of Montalcino, Italy
11 Dec 165238.6AppointedBishop of Montalcino, Italy
6 Mar 165641.9AppointedBishop of Osimo, Italy
9 Apr 165743.0Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
10 Nov 165945.6Elevated to Cardinal
1 Dec 165945.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
14 Nov 166753.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
3 Mar 168772.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
21 Feb 169176.8DiedBishop of Osimo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Bichi:
Antonio Cardinal Bichi (born , died ) Bishop of Osimo

  • a bishop for 38.2 years
  • a cardinal for 33.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 9 Apr 1657
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 208, and Page 104
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1652, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 16 Apr 2015