Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Orazio Cardinal Giustiniani, C.O. †

Deceased

Librarian of the Vatican Library

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio

Major Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1580Born
30 Aug 161434.5ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
13 Sep 164060.5AppointedBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
16 Sep 164060.5Ordained BishopBishop of Montalto (delle Marche), Italy
16 Jan 164564.8AppointedBishop of Nocera Umbra, Italy
6 Mar 164565.0Elevated to Cardinal
24 Apr 164565.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Onofrio
25 Sep 164666.5AppointedLibrarian of the Vatican Library
4 Dec 164767.7AppointedMajor Penitentiary of the Apostolic Penitentiary
25 Jul 164969.4DiedLibrarian of the Vatican Library

MicroData Summary for Orazio Giustiniani (VIAF: 89121424)
Orazio Cardinal Giustiniani C.O. (born , died ) Librarian of Vatican Library

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChios, Diocese of Chios (Scio), Greece
Ordained BishopS. Catarina da Siena, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Maria in Vallicella, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 8.8 years
  • a cardinal for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Mar 1645
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262, and Page 246
  • bp/bd/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1640, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017