Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Heinrich Fasching

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten

Titular Bishop of Acci


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1929BornHöfnerberg
29 Jun 195425.1Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 199364.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
24 May 199364.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Acci
4 Jul 199364.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Acci
7 Oct 200475.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
1 Jun 201485.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Heinrich Fasching:
Bishop Heinrich Fasching (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Sankt Pölten

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 135, Number 12,118
  • d: CB, 2 Jun 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 2 Jun 2014