Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Abbot Vinzenz (Rudolf) Wohlwend, O. Cist.

Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1969 Born
1990²20.2EnteredMember of Order of Cistercians
1994²24.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Cistercians
19 Sep 199828.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians
1 Aug 201848.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria
23 Nov 201849.1AppointedAbbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau, Austria

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vinzenz (Rudolf) Wohlwend
Abbot Vinzenz (Rudolf) Wohlwend O. Cist. (born ) Abbot of Wettingen-Mehrerau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrabs, Switzerland

Please contact the Abbot through the Territorial Abbey of Wettingen-Mehrerau.

  • a priest for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 23 Nov 2018

Quantcast