Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edoardo Facchini

Deceased

Bishop of Alatri, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1886Born
16 Jul 191125.5Ordained PriestPriest
5 May 193549.3AppointedBishop of Alatri, Italy
30 Jun 193549.4Ordained BishopBishop of Alatri, Italy
21 Oct 196276.8DiedBishop of Alatri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Facchini
Bishop Edoardo Facchini (born , died ) Bishop of Alatri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSora

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast