Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Colangelo

Deceased

Bishop of Nardò, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1879Born
4 Apr 193252.3AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
26 Jun 193252.6Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
16 Dec 193556.0AppointedBishop of Nardò, Italy
25 Jun 193757.6DiedBishop of Nardò, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Colangelo
Bishop Nicola Colangelo (born , died ) Bishop of Nardò

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchiavi di Abruzzo

  • a bishop for 4.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast