Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mel Rey Mingoa (Bobot) Uy

Bishop of Lucena, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1968 Born
24 May 199426.3Ordained PriestPriest of Romblon, Philippines
29 Jul 201749.5AppointedBishop of Lucena, Philippines
8 Nov 201749.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lucena, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Mel Rey Mingoa (Bobot) Uy
Bishop Mel Rey Mingoa (Bobot) Uy (born ) Bishop of Lucena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Agustin, Diocese of Romblon
Ordained BishopSaint Ferdinand, Cathedral, Lucena, Diocese of Lucena

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lucena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 29 Jul 2017
  • ob: CB, 3 Aug 2017
  • mn: CB, 5 Oct 2017
  • c2+: CB, 3 Nov 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 9 Nov 2017