Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Annibale Fantoni, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China

Titular Bishop of Paros

Titular See: (never consecrated)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1818²Born
19 Sep 184830.7AppointedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China
19 Sep 184830.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Paros
11 Jul 188264.5DiedPro-Vicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong), China

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Annibale Fantoni
Father Annibale Fantoni O.F.M. (born 1818, died ) Pro-Vicar Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBiella, Diocese of Biella, Italy
Death PlaceHu-Kia-Chuam

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1869
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 49, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast