Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Yanzhou [Yenchow]

Dioecesis Ienceuvensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Lu Peisan, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Jinan [Tsinan]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Yanzhou, Shandong, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}
2 January 1884ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Shantung {Scian-Ton} (Chan-tong) Mission "Sui Iuris" of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}
22 December 1885ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Yenchowfu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Shantung {Scian-Ton Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Yenchowfu
11 February 1925Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Yenchowfu Prefecture Apostolic of Tsingtao [Qingdao] (erected)
13 December 1933Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Yenchowfu Prefecture Apostolic of Yangku [Yanggu] (erected)
12 November 1934Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Yenchowfu Vicariate Apostolic of Tsaochowfu (erected)
Diocese of Yanzhou [Yenchow]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Yenchowfu Diocese of Yanzhou [Yenchow]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Yanzhou [Yenchow]
195060,0004,000,0001.5%930391,538824ap1951

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.2, 24 Dec 2019; Data: 20 Jan 2020

Quantcast