Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Changzhi [Luan]

Dioecesis Lunganensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Peter Ding Lingbin, Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si)
1838SplitVicariate Apostolic of Hukwang, Shansi [Shanxi], and Shensi [Shaanxi] Vicariate Apostolic of Houkouang
Vicariate Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si)
1844Territory AddedVicariate Apostolic of Kansu [Gansu] (suppressed) Vicariate Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si)
3 February 1844Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si) Vicariate Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi) (erected)
17 June 1890SplitVicariate Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si) Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}
17 June 1890SplitVicariate Apostolic of Shansi {Scian-Si} (Chan-Si) Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Shansi {Scian-Si Settentrionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Luanfu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southern Shansi {Scian-Si Meridionale} Vicariate Apostolic of Luanfu
17 June 1932Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Luanfu Prefecture Apostolic of Hungtung [Hongdong] (erected)
25 May 1936Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Luanfu Prefecture Apostolic of Xinjiang [Kiangchow] (erected)
Diocese of Changzhi [Luan]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Luanfu Diocese of Changzhi [Luan]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Changzhi [Luan]
194930,0003,000,0001.0%18181,66627ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 13 Apr 2021

Quantcast