Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

Dioecesis Scienscienensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Li Lian Gui, Bishop
  • Joseph Zhang Weizhu, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 8,400 (3,244 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Chang-Kia-Chuang, Xianxian, Hebei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale}
30 May 1856ErectedDiocese of Peking [Beijing] Vicariate Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale} (erected)
23 December 1899Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Eastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Orientale} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Sienhsien [Xianxian]
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Southeastern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Orientale} Vicariate Apostolic of Sienhsien [Xianxian]
24 May 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Sienhsien [Xianxian] Prefecture Apostolic of Yüngnien [Weixian] (erected)
11 March 1935Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Sienhsien [Xianxian] Prefecture Apostolic of Taming [Daming] (erected)
24 April 1939Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Sienhsien [Xianxian] Prefecture Apostolic of Kinghsien [Jingxian] (erected)
Diocese of Xianxian [Sienhsien]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Sienhsien [Xianxian] Diocese of Xianxian [Sienhsien]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Xianxian [Sienhsien]
195062,0002,200,0002.8%358411952113585221ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_d, v3.3.4, 28 Mar 2020; Data: 10 Nov 2020

Quantcast