Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Marie-Alphonse Favier, C.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China

Titular Bishop of Pentacomia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1837Born
1858¹20.2ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Mission
18 Oct 186124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
12 Nov 189760.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China
12 Nov 189760.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
20 Feb 189860.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
13 Apr 189961.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China
4 Apr 190567.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Marie-Alphonse Favier (VIAF: 88880525)
Bishop Pierre-Marie-Alphonse Favier C.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarsannay-la-Côte, Diocese of Dijon, France
Ordained BishopPeking, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin
Death PlacePeking, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 446
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 10
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 4, Number 123
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast