Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

Dioecesis Paotimensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Francis An Shuxin, Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 11 April 1946
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Beijing [Peking]
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: China
  • Square Kilometers: 12,000 (4,635 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Mission, Bishop's House, Baoding, Hebei, China

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Chi-Li {Ce-Li Centrale}
14 February 1910ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Northern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Settentrionale} o Pe-Kin Vicariate Apostolic of Central Chi-Li {Ce-Li Centrale} (erected)
15 April 1924Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Southwestern Chi-Li {Ce-Li Meridio-Occidentale}
Vicariate Apostolic of Central Chi-Li {Ce-Li Centrale}
Prefecture Apostolic of Lihsien (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Paotingfu
3 December 1924Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Central Chi-Li {Ce-Li Centrale} Vicariate Apostolic of Paotingfu
25 May 1929Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Paotingfu
Vicariate Apostolic of Peking [Beijing]
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Yihsien [Yixian] (erected)
Diocese of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]
11 April 1946ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Paotingfu Diocese of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Baoding [Paoting, Ching-YŁan]
195078,6012,000,0003.9%68681,1555935ap2002

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast